Singleton Enterprises Inc v. Maxon
Plaintiff: Singleton Enterprises Inc
Defendant: Nathan C Maxon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01565
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Jul 27 13:20:55 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 8/17/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/27/2020) (axm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT by Nathan C Maxon. (hml)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nathan C Maxon; served on 7/3/2020. (Powell, John)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nathan C Maxon. (hml)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Report to Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (hml) Modified text on 6/12/2020 (hml). (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/12/2020) (hml).
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Nathan C. Maxon filed by Singleton Enterprises, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10912299) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Powell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton Enterprises Inc v. Maxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singleton Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Jordan Alexander Mayfield
Represented By: John Andrew Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan C Maxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?