Jackson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Evender Gene Jackson, Jr
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2020cv01631
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE filed by Evender Gene Jackson, Jr. (hml)
July 17, 2020 Acknowledgment of Electronic Service re: Petition, supporting documents, if any, and Order(s) received by Office of Attorney General of Texas. Laura L Haney 7/17/2020. (mla)
July 17, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Fri Jul 17 09:43:03 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Electronically serving to the Office of the Texas Attorney General re: #9 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer. (ndt)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Payment filed by Evender Gene Jackson, Jr. (hml)
June 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Jun 22 16:43:53 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Evender Gene Jackson, Jr must address the following deficiency: A filing fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/23/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/22/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (ykp)
June 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Fri Jun 19 11:47:46 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:20-cv-00321. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
June 18, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Dallas Division. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/19/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Evender Gene Jackson, Jr. ORDERED that the petition is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/18/2020. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/19/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Evender Gene Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope(s))(mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evender Gene Jackson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?