Shetty et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Plaintiff: Saranya Chandrasekaran, Sushma Thimmappa Shetty, Prasanna Madala, Dinikeshwari Ari Byrappa Nagara, Sreekanth Marrikanti, Lanchana Shivananda and Sowjanya Varikunta
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Case Number: 3:2020cv01782
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Alberto Rivera on behalf of Dinikeshwari Ari Byrappa Nagara, Saranya Chandrasekaran, Prasanna Madala, Sreekanth Marrikanti, Sushma Thimmappa Shetty, Lanchana Shivananda, Sowjanya Varikunta. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rivera, Justin) (Main Document 23 replaced with flattened document on 7/15/2020) (pnp).
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ added as AUSA. (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1782-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Ada E. Brown and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "E". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/8/2020) (ctf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-00676. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas, pursuant to the Court Order entered 6/24/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's #14 Motion to Stay. Briefing on Defendant's #8 Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment is closed, and it is up to the transferee court to decide whether to enable the Government to address the merits under Fifth Circuit law. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/24/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: #16 Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/24/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #8 Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/24/2020. (lccrc3)(lctd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Kernan (VSC, #2 Declaration of John Peace (TSC), #3 Declaration of Dina Rosales (CSC), #4 Appendix A)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The reply is due on or before June 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/15/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SONAM AGARWALA, NIDHI AGGARWAL, PRASHANTHI ANANTHAPADMANABHAN SRIDHARAN, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, SANDEEP BALAR, LEENA BOSE, DINIKESHWARI BYRAPPA NAGARAJ, SARANYA CHANDRASEKARAN, JYOTHI CHAUHAN, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SAI SUBBALAKSHMI SILPA CHITTELLA, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSMITHA DANDE, NIDHI DAWRA, SHITAL NARADBHAI DOMADIA, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, RITEKA GHOSH, HIRAL ISHWARAL GOHEL, SUSWETHA GOODA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, JISHY JOHNSON MACHMMUTTATHUTHARAYIL, HARPREET KAUR, MONA KAUSHAL, DEEPA KRISHNAN, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, PRASANNA MADALA, SREEKANTH MARRIKANTI, MEGHA MITTAL, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, DHILIPKUMAR MUTHUSAMY, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, SOWMYA PASUPUNURI, SWAPNA PATARA, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, AALAPI MAEHENDRA SHAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, SUSHMA THIMMAPPA SHETTY, LANCHANA SHIVANANDA, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, ASHA SRINIVASA, SURUCHI THAPER, SOWJANYA VARIKUNTA, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, KRISHNA PRATHYUSHA VELMAKANTI, YAQIU ZHANG. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #11 Motion for Leave to File their Statement of Genuine Issues Necessary to be Litigated. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/09/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File by SONAM AGARWALA, NIDHI AGGARWAL, PRASHANTHI ANANTHAPADMANABHAN SRIDHARAN, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, SANDEEP BALAR, LEENA BOSE, DINIKESHWARI BYRAPPA NAGARAJ, SARANYA CHANDRASEKARAN, JYOTHI CHAUHAN, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SAI SUBBALAKSHMI SILPA CHITTELLA, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSMITHA DANDE, NIDHI DAWRA, SHITAL NARADBHAI DOMADIA, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, RITEKA GHOSH, HIRAL ISHWARAL GOHEL, SUSWETHA GOODA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, JISHY JOHNSON MACHMMUTTATHUTHARAYIL, HARPREET KAUR, MONA KAUSHAL, DEEPA KRISHNAN, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, PRASANNA MADALA, SREEKANTH MARRIKANTI, MEGHA MITTAL, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, DHILIPKUMAR MUTHUSAMY, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, SOWMYA PASUPUNURI, SWAPNA PATARA, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, AALAPI MAEHENDRA SHAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, SUSHMA THIMMAPPA SHETTY, LANCHANA SHIVANANDA, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, ASHA SRINIVASA, SURUCHI THAPER, SOWJANYA VARIKUNTA, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, KRISHNA PRATHYUSHA VELMAKANTI, YAQIU ZHANG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' statement of genuine issues necessary to be litigated)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SONAM AGARWALA, NIDHI AGGARWAL, PRASHANTHI ANANTHAPADMANABHAN SRIDHARAN, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, SANDEEP BALAR, LEENA BOSE, DINIKESHWARI BYRAPPA NAGARAJ, SARANYA CHANDRASEKARAN, JYOTHI CHAUHAN, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SAI SUBBALAKSHMI SILPA CHITTELLA, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSMITHA DANDE, NIDHI DAWRA, SHITAL NARADBHAI DOMADIA, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, RITEKA GHOSH, HIRAL ISHWARAL GOHEL, SUSWETHA GOODA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, JISHY JOHNSON MACHMMUTTATHUTHARAYIL, HARPREET KAUR, MONA KAUSHAL, DEEPA KRISHNAN, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, PRASANNA MADALA, SREEKANTH MARRIKANTI, MEGHA MITTAL, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, DHILIPKUMAR MUTHUSAMY, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, SOWMYA PASUPUNURI, SWAPNA PATARA, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, AALAPI MAEHENDRA SHAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, SUSHMA THIMMAPPA SHETTY, LANCHANA SHIVANANDA, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, ASHA SRINIVASA, SURUCHI THAPER, SOWJANYA VARIKUNTA, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, KRISHNA PRATHYUSHA VELMAKANTI, YAQIU ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File their Response to Defendant's #8 Motion to Transfer, Dismiss, or for Summary Judgment. The response shall be due on or before June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/22/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by SONAM AGARWALA, NIDHI AGGARWAL, PRASHANTHI ANANTHAPADMANABHAN SRIDHARAN, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, SANDEEP BALAR, LEENA BOSE, DINIKESHWARI BYRAPPA NAGARAJ, SARANYA CHANDRASEKARAN, JYOTHI CHAUHAN, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SAI SUBBALAKSHMI SILPA CHITTELLA, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSMITHA DANDE, NIDHI DAWRA, SHITAL NARADBHAI DOMADIA, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, RITEKA GHOSH, HIRAL ISHWARAL GOHEL, SUSWETHA GOODA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, JISHY JOHNSON MACHMMUTTATHUTHARAYIL, HARPREET KAUR, MONA KAUSHAL, DEEPA KRISHNAN, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, PRASANNA MADALA, SREEKANTH MARRIKANTI, MEGHA MITTAL, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, DHILIPKUMAR MUTHUSAMY, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, SOWMYA PASUPUNURI, SWAPNA PATARA, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, AALAPI MAEHENDRA SHAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, SUSHMA THIMMAPPA SHETTY, LANCHANA SHIVANANDA, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, ASHA SRINIVASA, SURUCHI THAPER, SOWJANYA VARIKUNTA, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, KRISHNA PRATHYUSHA VELMAKANTI, YAQIU ZHANG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the alternative, to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Dina Rosales (CSC), #4 Declaration Jennifer Roller (NSC), #5 Declaration John Peace (TSC), #6 Declaration of Patrick Kernan (VSC), #7 Appendix A, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order (alternative))(Walker, Johnny). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment on 5/12/2020 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY re #4 Response to Order of the Court filed by SONAM AGARWALA, NIDHI AGGARWAL, PRASHANTHI ANANTHAPADMANABHAN SRIDHARAN, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, SANDEEP BALAR, LEENA BOSE, DINIKESHWARI BYRAPPA NAGARAJ, SARANYA CHANDRASEKARAN, JYOTHI CHAUHAN, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SAI SUBBALAKSHMI SILPA CHITTELLA, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSMITHA DANDE, NIDHI DAWRA, SHITAL NARADBHAI DOMADIA, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, RITEKA GHOSH, HIRAL ISHWARAL GOHEL, SUSWETHA GOODA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, JISHY JOHNSON MACHMMUTTATHUTHARAYIL, HARPREET KAUR, MONA KAUSHAL, DEEPA KRISHNAN, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, PRASANNA MADALA, SREEKANTH MARRIKANTI, MEGHA MITTAL, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, DHILIPKUMAR MUTHUSAMY, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, SOWMYA PASUPUNURI, SWAPNA PATARA, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, AALAPI MAEHENDRA SHAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, SUSHMA THIMMAPPA SHETTY, LANCHANA SHIVANANDA, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, ASHA SRINIVASA, SURUCHI THAPER, SOWJANYA VARIKUNTA, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, KRISHNA PRATHYUSHA VELMAKANTI, YAQIU ZHANG. (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES filed by ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, MONA KAUSHAL, SWAPNA PATARA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SANDEEP BALAR, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, NIDHI DAWRA, VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, HARPREET KAUR, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, MEGHA MITTAL, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, SONAM AGARWALA, LEENA BOSE, RITEKA GHOSH, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSWETHA GOODA, SUSHMA THIMMAPPA SHETTY, ASHA SRINIVASA, SARANYA CHANDRASEKARAN, LANCHANA SHIVANANDA, SOWJANYA VARIKUNTA, SURUCHI THAPER, SHITAL NARADBHAI DOMADIA, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, YAQIU ZHANG, JYOTHI CHAUHAN, DINIKESHWARI BYRAPPA NAGARAJ, SAI SUBBALAKSHMI SILPA CHITTELLA, SUSMITHA DANDE, RAJNI TAPAN SHROFF, DHILIPKUMAR MUTHUSAMY, HIRAL ISHWARAL GOHEL, KRISHNA PRATHYUSHA VELMAKANTI, SREEKANTH MARRIKANTI, AALAPI MAEHENDRA SHAH, PRASHANTHI ANANTHAPADMANABHAN SRIDHARAN, NIDHI AGGARWAL, SOWMYA PASUPUNURI, JISHY JOHNSON MACHMMUTTATHUTHARAYIL, PRASANNA MADALA, DEEPA KRISHNAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table 1: Length of Pending I-539s, #2 Exhibit Table 2: Length of Pending I-765s)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to reply to Defendant's #4 Response to Order of the Court regarding whether this case is related to Pasem v. USCIS, 20-cv-344, under this Court's Local Rules. See LCvR 40.5. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before Thursday, March 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/19/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/10/2020 (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, and Objection to Notice of Related Case filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice due by 3/17/2020 (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is hereby ORDERED to file a notice responding to Plaintiffs' [1-5] Notice of Designation of Related Civil Case and inform the Court of its position as to whether this case is related to Pasem v. USCIS, 20-cv-344, under this Court's Local Rules. See LCvR 40.5. Defendant shall file this Notice on or before Tuesday, March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/10/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6898130) filed by VIVEK RAMESH KULKARNI, ARCHANA REDDY PALVAI, MONA KAUSHAL, SWAPNA PATARA, LOUISE JANE HARDING, SANDEEP BALAR, HARPREET KAUR, SHILPI MUKHERJEE, SWETHA CHIYYAVARAM, VIDHYA SANJAIKANTH, SHREYA SATISH KULKARNI, DEEPTHI ERRABELLI, DEEPALI PRABHAKAR NEB, TEJASWINI CHILAMKURTI, SHIVARANJINI HIREMATH BASAVARAJAIAH, HIRAL PRATIK SHAH, MEGHA MITTAL, DHIVYA VEDAGIRI RAJALU, AISHWARYA ASHOK KULKARNI, PADMAJA MUTTHOJU, SONAM AGARWALA, DEEPA RAJKUMAR ISRANI, LEENA BOSE, RITEKA GHOSH, SUCHITRA RAGHUNATHAN, NIDHI DAWRA, NIRALI MANOJ DAMANIA, SUSWETHA GOODA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request for Summons as to the US Attorney's Office, #3 Summons Request for Summons as to the US Attorney General, #4 Summons Request for Summons as to the DHS General Counsel, #5 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Case, #6 Exhibit Table 1--Length of Pending I-539s, #7 Exhibit Table 2--Length of Pending I-765)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shetty et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saranya Chandrasekaran
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sushma Thimmappa Shetty
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prasanna Madala
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinikeshwari Ari Byrappa Nagara
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sreekanth Marrikanti
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanchana Shivananda
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sowjanya Varikunta
Represented By: Steven A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?