Kiralp et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Berna Kiralp and Mehmet Kiralp
Defendant: Chad Wolf, William D Bierman, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States of America, USCIS National Benefits Center and USCIS Texas Service Center
Case Number: 3:2020cv01786
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ added as AUSA. (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01267. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Interdistrict transfer to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 7/7/2020, filed. (jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/7/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/7/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Berna Kiralp, Mehmet Kiralp, filed.(Green, Sheridan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/7/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, filed.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/7/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION/COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24532873.) filed by Berna Kiralp, Mehmet Kiralp.(Green, Sheridan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiralp et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berna Kiralp
Represented By: Sheridan Gary Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehmet Kiralp
Represented By: Sheridan Gary Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Bierman
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS National Benefits Center
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Texas Service Center
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?