Khanal v. Douglas et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Khanal
Defendant: Jerrick Douglas, DTI 2019 Transport LLC and CRST Malone Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01881
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Designation of Mediator by CRST Malone Inc, DTI 2019 Transport LLC, Jerrick Douglas. (Bassett, Mike)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/14/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Discovery due by 3/25/2021. Motions due by 4/26/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 10/12/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/14/2020) (chmb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Affidavits by Joyce Khanal. (Clay, Brennan) Modified event on 8/5/2020 (mla).
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Submission of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Joyce Khanal. (Clay, Brennan) Modified event text on 7/31/2020 (axm).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/27/2020) (chmb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by CRST Malone Inc, DTI 2019 Transport LLC, Jerrick Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bassett, Mike)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joyce Khanal. (Clay, Brennan)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/16/2020) (chmb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DTI 2019 Transport, LLC. (Bassett, Mike)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRST Malone, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Admiralty Holdings Inc. for CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bassett, Mike)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by CRST Malone, Inc., Jerrick Douglas, DTI 2019 Transport, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11001450) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bassett, Mike)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khanal v. Douglas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrick Douglas
Represented By: Teegan Hill
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Represented By: Teegan JoiCara Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTI 2019 Transport LLC
Represented By: Teegan Hill
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Represented By: Teegan JoiCara Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Malone Inc
Represented By: Teegan Hill
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Represented By: Teegan JoiCara Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Khanal
Represented By: Brennan Edward Clay
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Witherite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?