Sanders v. Walmart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Shuntay Sanders
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc and Walmart Stores Texas LLC doing business as Walmart Supercenter
Case Number: 3:2020cv01891
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 9/8/2021 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 12/11/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2020. Motions due by 4/30/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/31/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 8/6/2021. Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/11/2020) (axm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Walmart Stores Inc, Walmart Stores Texas LLC. (Moses, Steven)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the FRCvP, lead counsel are directed to meet and confer for the purpose of submitting a Joint Status Report as follows. (Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order) (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/20/2020) (twd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Moses, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, d/b/a Walmart Supercenter. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11004367) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Moses, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Walmart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc
Represented By: David A Johnson
Represented By: Steven Jerome Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Texas LLC doing business as Walmart Supercenter
Represented By: David A Johnson
Represented By: Steven Jerome Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuntay Sanders
Represented By: Bryan D Pope
Represented By: Larry F Taylor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?