Carter Diplomacy LLC v. Western World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carter Diplomacy LLC
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv02177
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON #6 JOINT MOTION TO ABATE PENDING OUTCOME OF APPRAISAL: The Court orders this cause abated for a period of 60 days, by which time the Court directs the appraisal to have been completed, and upon the expiration of which the parties are to immediately inform the Court of the results of the appraisal. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/11/2020) (axm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue or Abate in Favor of Appraisal filed by Western World Insurance Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hogue, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Western World Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. Amendment. (Hogue, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/21/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (jmg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: No later than 9/8/2020, defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (jmg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11083856) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index in Support of Removal, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hogue, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter Diplomacy LLC v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Diplomacy LLC
Represented By: Preston J Dugas, III
Represented By: Carin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert G Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?