I&I Hair Corporation v. Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: I&I Hair Corporation
Defendant: Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co., Inc., Hair Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Femi Collection and Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Janet Collection
Case Number: 3:2020cv02179
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY filed by Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc re: #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint. (Ni, Hao)
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by I&I Hair Corporation re: #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint. (Chaudhari, Papool)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Adjourn the Scheduling Conference and Joint Report [ECF No. #17 ]. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is ORDERED that the deadlines listed in this Court's Order Requiring Scheduling Conference and Report for Contents of Scheduling Order [ECF No. #12 ] are STAYED pending this Court's decision of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count IV and Motion to Stay [ECF No. #9 ]. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/21/2020) (ctf)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Adjourn Scheduling Conference and Joint Report re: #12 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal filed by Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc. (Choi, John)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John H. Choi. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/14/2020) (chmb)
September 11, 2020 The Clerk's Office declines to issue a Clerk's Entry of Default for the following reason: the defendants have filed a motion to dismiss and a motion to stay (doc. 9), which is an attempt to defend. (oyh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to issue Clerk's Entry of Default as to Counts I, II, III, and V of the Complaint filed by I&I Hair Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chaudhari, Papool)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by I&I Hair Corporation of Defendant Hair Plus Trading Co., Inc. dba Femi Collection (Chaudhari, Papool)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by I&I Hair Corporation of Defendant Beauty Plus Trading Co., Inc. dba Janet Collection (Chaudhari, Papool)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/30/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/9/2020) (mjr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc re #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,,,, (Ni, Hao)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ni, Hao)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,,,, () filed by Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc (Ni, Hao)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John H. Choi (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11150923) filed by Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ni, Hao)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hao Ni on behalf of Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ni, Hao)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/19/2020) (chmb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co Inc. (oyh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (oyh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by I&I Hair Corporation. (Chaudhari, Papool)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc, Hair Plus Trading Co., Inc. filed by I&I Hair Corporation. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11084552) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F) (Chaudhari, Papool)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I&I Hair Corporation v. Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hair Plus Trading Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hair Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Femi Collection
Represented By: John Hoon Choi
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Plus Trading Co Inc doing business as Janet Collection
Represented By: John Hoon Choi
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I&I Hair Corporation
Represented By: Papool S Chaudhari
Represented By: Sul Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?