Ross v. USA
Petitioner: Jarvis Dupree Ross
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv02245
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Aug 18 10:42:10 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (svc) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (svc).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONOF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Habeas corpus petition is successive, and the clerk is directed to transfer the matter to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Fifth Circuit notified via copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing.) Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/17/2020) (svc)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Jarvis Dupree Ross. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/31/2020) (svc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:08-cr-00167-3) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jarvis Dupree Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?