Walker et al v. iHeart Communications Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patrick E. Walker, Lisa Henshaw and Patrick E Walker
Defendant: THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF IHEART COMMUNICATIONS, INC.,, JOHN DOES 1-30, IHEART COMMUNICATIONS, INC., THE RETIREMENT BENEFITS COMMITTEE, The Board of Directors of iHeart Communications Inc and iHeart Communications Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02359
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' responses are due 11/25/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/14/2020) (chmb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JOHN DOES 1-30, The Board of Directors of iHeart Communications Inc, The Retirement Benefits Committee, iHeart Communications Inc. (Garner, Judy)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Retirement Benefits Committee. Waiver sent on 9/15/2020. (Gyandoh, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Board of Directors of iHeart Communications Inc. Waiver sent on 9/15/2020. (Gyandoh, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to iHeart Communications Inc. Waiver sent on 9/15/2020. (Gyandoh, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lisa Henshaw, Patrick E Walker. (Sears, Natalie)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark K. Gyandoh. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/20/2020) (chmb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald R. Reavey. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/20/2020) (chmb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Mark K. Gyandon (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11095261) filed by Lisa Henshaw, Patrick E. Walker (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Harris, Craig) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened copy on 8/20/2020) (cea). (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened copy on 8/20/2020) (pnp).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Donald R. Reavey (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11095253) filed by Lisa Henshaw, Patrick E. Walker (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Harris, Craig) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened copy on 8/20/2020) (cea). (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened copy on 8/20/2020) (pnp).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Patrick E. Walker, Lisa Henshaw. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11095213) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Harris, Craig) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2020) (mjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. iHeart Communications Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick E. Walker
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Natalie A Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Henshaw
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Natalie A Sears
Represented By: Donald R Reavey
Represented By: Mark K Gyandoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick E Walker
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Natalie A Sears
Represented By: Donald R Reavey
Represented By: Mark K Gyandoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF IHEART COMMUNICATIONS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-30
Represented By: Judy Bennett Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHEART COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RETIREMENT BENEFITS COMMITTEE
Represented By: Judy Bennett Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of iHeart Communications Inc
Represented By: Judy Bennett Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iHeart Communications Inc
Represented By: Judy Bennett Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?