Harding v. Mid-Continental Restoration Company Inc
Plaintiff: Trent E Harding
Defendant: Mid-Continental Restoration Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02585
Filed: August 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Oct 8 09:12:59 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION: The Court granted Harding leave to proceed in forma pauperis under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915, see Dkt. No. #5 , and entered an order regarding the screening of his claims under Section 1915(e)(2)(B), requiring that he file an amended complaint by 10/5/2020, see Dkt. No. #6 . On that day, Harding moved to extend the deadline (for an unspecified period) to allow him more time to retain counsel. See Dkt. No. #7 . The Court GRANTS his motion to the extent that it EXTENDS Harding's deadline to file an amended complaint to 11/6/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/7/2020) (ctf)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Obtain Counsel filed by Trent E Harding. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
September 3, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Sep 3 10:18:57 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 3, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Sep 3 10:12:31 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT: Trent E Harding must address the following deficiency: Complaint lacks enough facts to allege a plausible claim under the FMLA. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 10/5/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/2/2020) (ndt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt). Modified on 9/4/2020 (mcrd).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. But service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its screening of this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/2/2020) (ndt)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Trent E Harding. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Trent E Harding. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
September 1, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Tue Sep 1 14:10:41 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 29, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mid-Continental Restoration Company Inc filed by Trent E Harding. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cea) ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding v. Mid-Continental Restoration Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent E Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continental Restoration Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?