Robinson v. Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Rodrione Robinson
Defendant: Progressive Rehab Solutions, LLC and Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02767
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 1/18/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021. Motions due by 9/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Settlement Status Report due by 8/23/2021. Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/23/2020) (jmg)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Martinson, Gavin)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/2/2020) (axm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Renee L Harris on behalf of Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Harris, Renee)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Martinson, Gavin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gavin S Martinson added to party Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC (pty:dft). (Martinson, Gavin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC ; served on 9/10/2020. (Gilmore, Jamie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (oyh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rodrione Robinson. (Gilmore, Jamie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Progressive Rehab Solutions, LLC filed by Rodrione Robinson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11142170) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gilmore, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Rehab Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC
Represented By: Renee L Harris
Represented By: Gavin S Martinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrione Robinson
Represented By: Jamie Jean Gilmore
Represented By: Brittney Lynne Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?