Register v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Register
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., CR Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv02831
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/23/2020. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/5/2020) (oyh)
October 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Taylor Tapley Daly on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Incorporated. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Brandee J. Kowalzyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Incorporated. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 4, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for CR Bard Incorporated. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Incorporated. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc (pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party CR Bard Incorporated (pty:dft) (Matthews, Melissa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Incorporated. (jmg)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Register. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Proposed Summons) (Martin, Ben)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kathryn Register. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11165745) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Martin, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Register v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Register
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Cameron Earl Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?