G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Linares Guanajuato Inc et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Defendant: Linares Guanajuato Inc doing business as Linares Guanajuato doing business as Taqueria Linares, Juan Orona individually doing business as Linares Guanajuato doing business as Taqueria Linares and Linares Guanajuato Inc individually doing business as Linares Guanajuato doing business as Taqueria Linares
Case Number: 3:2020cv02835
Filed: September 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1131 ca
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Juan Orona ; served on 10/29/2020. (Diaz, David)
November 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Linares Guanajuato Inc ; served on 10/29/2020. (Diaz, David)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, Plaintiff may proceed may proceed without designating local counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/21/2020) (chmb)
September 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Diaz, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Linares Guanajuato Inc, Juan Orona. (jmg)
September 13, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
September 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. (Diaz, David)
September 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11166795) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Diaz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Linares Guanajuato Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linares Guanajuato Inc doing business as Linares Guanajuato doing business as Taqueria Linares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Orona individually doing business as Linares Guanajuato doing business as Taqueria Linares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linares Guanajuato Inc individually doing business as Linares Guanajuato doing business as Taqueria Linares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Represented By: David M Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?