Fleischman v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Chris L. Fleischman
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, Johnson & Johnson Inc and DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2020cv02881
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 Case electronically transferred in from District of Idaho; Case Number 1:20-cv-00096. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of Texas (Attachments: #1 text entry)(alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER- CTO. CTO-340, MDL 2244 (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Action MDL 2244 (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to informal communications between the Court and counsel (namely the likelihood that this case will be transferred to a MDL panel) the deadline set forth in the Court's prior order (Dkt. 7 ) is vacated. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Pursuant to the #5 Litigation Order, the parties are ordered to file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan by August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mt) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
April 28, 2020 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. On or before April 20, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc., Chris L. Fleischman, Johnson & Johnson, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/27/2020. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 26, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:20-cv-96-DCN (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(5)(iii), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge.Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 25, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate SYNTHES, INC., Other Affiliate Synthes USA, LLC, Other Affiliate DePuy Synthes, Inc., Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson International, Other Affiliate DePuy Spine, LLC, Other Affiliate Depuy Products, Inc., Other Affiliate Codman & Shurtleff, Inc., Other Affiliate Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson Company for DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc... (Watkins, Elijah) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc. from District Court of Fourth Judicial District, County of Ada, case number CV01-19-17559.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2016428.), filed by DePuy Orthopaedic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Service, #6 Cover Sheet)(Watkins, Elijah) [Transferred from Idaho on 9/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleischman v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris L. Fleischman
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?