McCall v. New American Funding
Plaintiff: Shani Adia McCall
Defendant: New American Funding
Case Number: 3:2020cv03023
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Nov 6 09:17:45 CST 2020 (crt)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff has been given ample opportunity to respond to the Court's order. She has impliedly refused or declined to do so. Therefore, this action should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order and for lack of prosecution. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/5/2020) (ctf)
October 7, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Oct 7 09:41:20 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to: (1) file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO-239 Form that includes all of the information requested by the form; (2) file an amended complaint that meets the requirements of Rule 8(a); and (3) register to use the Court's electronic filing system, all by 10/27/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/6/2020) (ctf)
October 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Oct 2 10:16:05 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shani Adia McCall. (mjr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shani Adia McCall. (mjr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against New American Funding filed by Shani Adia McCall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. New American Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shani Adia McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New American Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?