Scott v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Walter R Scott, Jr
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2020cv03035
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-12610. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the USDC for the TXND. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2020.]
September 16, 2020 CLERK"S TEXT ORDER - The Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - document #2 - submitted by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC on 9/16/2020. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/2/2020. (mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. from Superior Court of Monmouth County, case number MON-L-1668-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number BNJDC-11345663), filed by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Michael Charles Zogby
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter R Scott, Jr
Represented By: Joshua S Kincannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?