Unicorn Global Inc et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Unicorn Global Inc, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd and Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Walmart Inc and Wal-Mart.com USA LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03111
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Case Stayed per #37 Order. (axm)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Sever and Stay. Plaintiffs' claims against Walmart in this action are severed and stayed pending the adjudication of the claims between Plaintiffs and Golabs. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to assign a separate cause number to the severed action and assign the new action directly to the undersigned judge. The new case is stayed pending resolution of Plaintiffs' claims against Golabs in this case. (Civil case 3:20-cv-03111-N) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/9/2020) (axm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of withdraw re: #30 Response/Objection filed by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc (Ni, Hao)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #34 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Plaintiffs response to Golabs Amended Answer and Counterclaims is due October 16, 2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/8/2020) (chmb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ni, Hao)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File. (Golabss Motion for Leave to File Golabss Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, And Counterclaims and The Walmart Defendants Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to be filed by Clerk as of 9/25/20.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/7/2020) (chmb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 31 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Ni, Hao)
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 ***WITHDRAWN PER #36 NOTICE of withdraw*** RESPONSE filed by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc re: #21 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever (Wang, Timothy) Modified docket text on 10/9/2020 (oyh).
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. If additional patent or trademark numbers are included, the clerk will prepare the appropriate Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office., COUNTERCLAIM against Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC (jmg)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joel Chao-Lee Lin terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/25/2020) (ndt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Golabs Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims and the Walmart Defendants Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Supporting Brief filed by Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Pezzano, Tony)
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joel Lin filed by Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lin, Joel)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tony V. Pezzano. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/21/2020) (chmb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11170261) filed by Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Golabs Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Golabs Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Wal-Mart.com USA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Wal-Mart.com USA LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Tony Pezzano added to party Walmart Inc(pty:cc) (Pezzano, Tony)
September 12, 2020 Filing 24 (Document Restricted) Answer and Counterclaims Exhibits 7-9 (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/11/2020) filed by Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 07, #2 Exhibit(s) 08, #3 Exhibit(s) 09) (Lin, Joel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael C Wilson, Wallace Dunwoody terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/11/2020) (axm)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is therefore directed to seal certain exhibits in Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims that were designated CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION pursuant to the parties' separate and ongoing litigation (Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-00754-N). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/11/2020) (axm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Sever filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Reid Thorton, #2 Proposed Order) (Lin, Joel)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/9/2020) (mjr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Golabs Inc, Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Golabs Inc, Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 01, #2 Exhibit(s) 02, #3 Exhibit(s) 03, #4 Exhibit(s) 04, #5 Exhibit(s) 05, #6 Exhibit(s) 06, #7 Exhibit(s) 07 - Sealed, #8 Exhibit(s) 08 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit(s) 09 - Sealed, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11) (Lin, Joel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dunwoody, S)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File To File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Golabs Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lin, Joel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moore, Stevenson)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neal G Massand on behalf of Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Massand, Neal)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hao Ni on behalf of Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ni, Hao)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Tiewei Wang on behalf of Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wang, Timothy)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel C. Lin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/28/2020) (chmb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11117187) filed by Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing- New York Appellate Division- 1st Department)Attorney Joel Chao-Lee Lin added to party Golabs Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Chao-Lee Lin added to party Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Chao-Lee Lin added to party Wal-Mart.com USA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Chao-Lee Lin added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft) (Lin, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set per 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 9/8/2020. (ndt)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants response to the complaint is due September 8, 2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/24/2020) (chmb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time answer or respond filed by Golabs Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chu, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Golabs Inc; served on 8/5/2020. (jmg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC; served on 8/4/2020; Wal-Mart.com USA LLC; served on 8/4/2020; Walmart Inc; served on 8/4/2020. (jmg)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/10/2020) (chmb)
August 3, 2020 Judge Ed Kinkeade reassigned as presiding judge per Special Order 3-287. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to the case. (ctf)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc. (hml)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (hml)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd, Unicorn Global Inc. (Dunwoody, S)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Golabs Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA LLC, Walmart Inc filed by Unicorn Global Inc, Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd, Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11037598) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Cover Sheet) (Dunwoody, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicorn Global Inc et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Represented By: Tony V Pezzano
Represented By: William Kriston Knisley
Represented By: Joel Chao-Lee Lin
Represented By: William Chu
Represented By: Salina Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Tony V Pezzano
Represented By: William Kriston Knisley
Represented By: Joel Chao-Lee Lin
Represented By: William Chu
Represented By: Salina Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart.com USA LLC
Represented By: Tony V Pezzano
Represented By: William Kriston Knisley
Represented By: Joel Chao-Lee Lin
Represented By: William Chu
Represented By: Salina Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicorn Global Inc
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: S Wallace Dunwoody, IV
Represented By: Michael C Wilson
Represented By: Neal G Massand
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhen Uni-Sun Electronic Co Ltd
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: S Wallace Dunwoody, IV
Represented By: Michael C Wilson
Represented By: Neal G Massand
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co Ltd
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: S Wallace Dunwoody, IV
Represented By: Michael C Wilson
Represented By: Neal G Massand
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?