Texas Health Resources v. Aetna Health Inc
Plaintiff: Texas Health Resources
Defendant: Aetna Health Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03130
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
October 15, 2020 New case number 3:20-cv-3130-X, Texas Health Resources v. Aetna Health Inc has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 4:20-cv-1103-O. Future filings should be made in the DALLAS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (cea)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AETNA HEALTH INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a): IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the #5 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and the above-styled and numbered action is hereby transferred to the Dallas Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/15/2020) (pef)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Aetna Health Inc re #5 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to Dallas Division (Strahan, M)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to Dallas Division filed by Aetna Health Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Strahan, M)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John B Shely on behalf of Aetna Health Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Shely, John)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Transfer Motion due by 10/14/2020. Response due by 10/19/2020. Reply due by 10/21/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/7/2020) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef)
October 6, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Health Inc. (See document #1 -11 for image) (pef)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Aetna Health Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11240544) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Index, #4 Exhibit(s) A, #5 Exhibit(s) B, #6 Exhibit(s) C, #7 Exhibit(s) D, #8 Exhibit(s) E, #9 Exhibit(s) F, #10 Exhibit(s) G, #11 Exhibit(s) H, #12 Exhibit(s) H-1) (Strahan, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Health Resources v. Aetna Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Inc
Represented By: Karin Knowles Cagle
Represented By: M Katherine Strahan
Represented By: John B Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Health Resources
Represented By: Blair Grant Francis
Represented By: Nickelette Page Lotspeich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?