MedARC LLC v. Scott & White Health Plan
Plaintiff: Revolution Neuromonitoring LLC, Revolution Monitoring Management LLC and MedARC LLC
Defendant: Scott & White Health Plan and Scott and White Health Plan
Not Classified By Court: Harlin D Hale and Case Admin Sup
Case Number: 3:2020cv03241
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by MedARC LLC re: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Albert, Craig)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Scott and White Health Plan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Herman, Jonathan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 *** DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOC #8 *** Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Scott and White Health Plan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Herman, Jonathan) Modified on 12/1/2020 (mjr).
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Scott and White Health Plan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Herman, Jonathan)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Under authority of 28 U.S.C. sec. 157(a), this case is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Harlin D. Hale for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/30/2020) (mjr)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Scott and White Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Herman, Jonathan)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/26/2020) (svc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Scott & White Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet (Amended)) (Herman, Jonathan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scott & White Health Plan. (Herman, Jonathan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Scott & White Health Plan. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11297859) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit A - Index, #4 Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Executed Citation, #6 State Docket Sheet) (Herman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Scott & White Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revolution Neuromonitoring LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revolution Monitoring Management LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott & White Health Plan
Represented By: Allison Pham
Represented By: Jonathan M Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott and White Health Plan
Represented By: Allison Pham
Represented By: Jonathan M Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Harlin D Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?