MedARC LLC v. Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03245
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY filed by Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement. (Liu, Emily)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The defendant's reply is due December 21, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/4/2020) (chmb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Liu, Emily) Modified text and linkage on 12/4/2020 (axm).
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by MedARC LLC re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Albert, Craig)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Liu, Emily)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company. (Richardson, Jason)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11299373) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Richardson, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Medicare Advantage Company
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Furman
Represented By: Jason A. Richardson
Represented By: Emily Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Represented By: Catherine B Baldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?