MedARC LLC v. Golden Rule Insurance Co
Plaintiff: MedARC, LLC and MedARC LLC
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Co. and Golden Rule Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2020cv03300
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY filed by Golden Rule Insurance Co re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Jubinsky, Andrew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by MedARC LLC re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Albert, Craig)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Golden Rule Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - State Court File, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - List of Parties & Counsel) (Reece, Amber) Modified event text on 11/19/2020. (jmg)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: No later than 14 days from the date of this order, Golden Rule is hereby ORDERED to file an amended notice of removal that alleges specific facts showing diversity of citizenship in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332. The Court further ORDERS MedARC LLC to disclose the state of residence of every member of its underlying LLC members, in order to facilitate proper pleading. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/4/2020) (jmg)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Golden Rule Insurance Co with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Golden Rule Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Golden Rule Insurance Co.. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Golden Rule Insurance Co.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11321770) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) 1 - Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 - Index of State Court Documents, #5 Exhibit(s) 2-1 - Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit(s) 2-2 Petition, #7 Exhibit(s) 2-3 Citation, #8 Exhibit(s) 2-4 - Notice of Intent to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit(s) 2-5 - Return of Service, #10 Exhibit(s) 2-6 - Defendant's Original Answer, #11 Exhibit(s) 3 - List of Parties and Counsel) (Jubinsky, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Golden Rule Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC, LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Co.
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Amber Dawn Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Co
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Amber Dawn Reece
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?