Vasquez v. Sands et al
Plaintiff: Merit Trucking Company, Inc. and Amanda Vasquez
Defendant: Phillip Sands and Merit Trucking Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03303
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per 28 Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. (oyh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Mailing: Certified NEF of Document number 10 and docket sheet mailed to County Court at Law No.3 on 12/2/2020. (oyh) (oyh). Modified docket text on 12/2/2020 (oyh).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Remand. This case is hereby REMANDED back to the County Court at Law No. 3 for Dallas County, Texas. In light of this Order, Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Remand and #5 Amended Motion to Remand are moot. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/2/2020) (chmb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Merit Trucking Company Inc, Phillip Sands (Chamblee, William)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Rule 11 Agreement filed by Merit Trucking Company Inc, Phillip Sands. (Chamblee, William)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than December 8, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. CDT, why the parties failed to comply with the Courts #6 Status Report Order. Should any party or counsel fail to comply with this Order, such party or counsel or both may be subject to sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/1/2020) (chmb)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 11/26/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/5/2020) (svc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Amanda Vasquez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Wolf, Julie)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Amanda Vasquez (Wolf, Julie)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merit Trucking Company Inc, Phillip Sands. (Chamblee, William)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Phillip Sands, Merit Trucking Company Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11325974) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit(s) Citation to Phillip Sands, #4 Exhibit(s) Citation to Merit Trucking, Inc., #5 Exhibit(s) Citation Return- Merit Trucking, Inc., #6 Exhibit(s) Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue) (Chamblee, William)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Sands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merit Trucking Company, Inc.
Represented By: William H Chamblee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Vasquez
Represented By: Julie S Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Sands
Represented By: William H Chamblee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Trucking Company Inc
Represented By: William H Chamblee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?