MedARC LLC v. Government Employees Health Association Inc
Plaintiff: MedARC, LLC and MedARC LLC
Defendant: Government Employees Health Association, Inc. and Government Employees Health Association Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv03325
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by MedARC LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Albert, Craig) Modified event text on 11/16/2020 (jmg).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Ada Brown no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/12/2020) (ndt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Government Employees Health Association, Inc.. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Government Employees Health Association, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11334133) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 - Declaration, #5 Exhibit(s) 3 - Contract, #6 Exhibit(s) 4 -Statement of Benefits, #7 Exhibit(s) 5 -Index of State Court Documents, #8 Exhibit(s) 5-A - Case Information Sheet, #9 Exhibit(s) 5-B - Petition, #10 Exhibit(s) 5-C - Citation, #11 Exhibit(s) 5-D - Return of Service, #12 Exhibit(s) 5-E - Rule 11 Agreement) (Jubinsky, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Government Employees Health Association Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Health Association, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Amber Dawn Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Health Association Inc
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Amber Dawn Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC, LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Craig A Albert
Represented By: Jonathan A Aldaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?