Cuadrado v. TI Communities
Plaintiff: Felix V Cuadrado
Defendant: TI Communities
Case Number: 3:2020cv03492
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2021. Motions due by 9/17/2021. Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Settlement Status Report due by 3/31/2021. Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 1/24/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/23/2020) (mjr)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by TI Communities. (Bauer, Kristin)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED INDEX OF DOCUMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by TI Communities. (Bauer, Kristin) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (jmg).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/22/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/1/2020) (jmg)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:20-cv-3492-M. (ctf)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TI Communities. (Bauer, Kristin)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by TI COMMUNITIES. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11388305) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index (Ex. A-B), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bauer, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuadrado v. TI Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix V Cuadrado
Represented By: Vincent James Bhatti
Represented By: Ditty Susan Bhatti
Represented By: Ditty S Bhatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TI Communities
Represented By: Julie Ann Farmer
Represented By: Kristin L Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?