Brown v. Exeter Finance LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kent-Shay Brown, Jr. and Kent-Shay Brown, Jr
Defendant: Brad Nall and Exeter Finance LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00169
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acceptance of Oath of Office filed by Kent-Shay Brown, Jr. (jmg)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of ACCEPTANCE of OATH OF OFFICE filed by Kent-Shay Brown, Jr (Brown, Kent-Shay)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing re: First Request for Discovery by Kent-Shay Brown, Jr. (Brown, Kent-Shay) Modified text on 3/15/2021 (jmg).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendants have filed a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss. (ECF No. #6 ). Accordingly, the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order until it issues its findings, conclusions, and recommendation on Defendants' motion to dismiss, provided a scheduling order is still necessary. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2). The Court will address the parties' individual scheduling proposals if the case survives Defendants' motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/10/2021) (hml)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY filed by Brad Nall, Exeter Finance LLC re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Hayes, Elizabeth)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Kent-Shay Brown, Jr re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (hml)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Kent-Shay Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (hml)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Brad Nall, Exeter Finance LLC. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #6 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/25/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/8/2021) (axm)
February 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Feb 8 14:51:40 CST 2021 (crt)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Brad Nall, Exeter Finance LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayes, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Feb 1 12:57:51 CST 2021 (crt)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court orders the parties to each submit a written report regarding a proposed schedule by 2/26/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/29/2021) (mjr)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exeter Finance LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Enzo Parent LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Blackstone Group, Inc. for Exeter Finance LLC. (Hayes, Elizabeth) Modified Event Text on 1/27/2021 (hml).
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Brad Nall, Exeter Finance LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Enzo Parent LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Blackstone Group, Inc. for Exeter Finance LLC. (Hayes, Elizabeth) Modified Event Text on 1/27/2021 (hml).
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Exeter Finance LLC, Brad Nall. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11550942) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) B-1, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) C-1, #6 Exhibit(s) C-2, #7 Exhibit(s) C-3, #8 Exhibit(s) C-4, #9 Exhibit(s) C-5, #10 Exhibit(s) C-6, #11 Exhibit(s) C-7, #12 Exhibit(s) C-8, #13 Exhibit(s) C-9, #14 Exhibit(s) C-10, #15 Exhibit(s) C-11, #16 Exhibit(s) C-12, #17 Exhibit(s) C-13, #18 Exhibit(s) C-14, #19 Exhibit(s) C-15, #20 Exhibit(s) C-16, #21 Exhibit(s) C-17, #22 Exhibit(s) C-18, #23 Exhibit(s) C-19) (Hayes, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Exeter Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Nall
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent-Shay Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent-Shay Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?