Martinez v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Araceli Martinez
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00286
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER: The Court grants the #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Fort Worth Division. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/1/2021) (ykp)
March 1, 2021 Case copied to 4:21-cv-00402-O. Transfer to Fort Worth Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (twd)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Fort Worth Division filed by Araceli Martinez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ada Brown for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:21-cv-286-E. (ctf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (hml)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Target Corporation filed by Araceli Martinez. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11590389.) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (O'Kelly, Nicholas) Modified filer fee on 2/9/2021 (hml).
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Araceli Martinez. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Araceli Martinez
Represented By: Nicholas O'Kelly
Represented By: Nicholas A O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?