Taylor v. Patin
Plaintiff: Michae-John D Taylor and Michael-John D Taylor
Defendant: Don Patin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00387
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 14 Mail returned as undeliverable. #8 Order And Notice of Deficiency, received back from Michael John Taylor as Not deliverable as addressed. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party, #1 Judge Cummings (Dallas) received back from Michael-John D Taylor as Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (jmg)
April 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Apr 19 09:52:54 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael-John D Taylor. (jmg)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Michael-John D Taylor. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (jmg)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Submit Evidence filed by Michael-John D Taylor. (jmg)
April 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Apr 8 08:26:28 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff has been given ample opportunity to respond to the Court's order. He has impliedly refused or declined to do so. Therefore, this action should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order and for lack of prosecution. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/7/2021) (ctf)
March 1, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. NEF of document 7 Mon Mar 1 10:01:28 CST 2021 (crt)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Michae-John D Taylor must address the following deficiency: Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is incomplete. Additionally, the complaint does not meet the basic pleading requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 3/22/2021 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/26/2021) (chmb)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER. Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written Notice of Change of Address with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/26/2021) (chmb)
February 24, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Feb 24 08:52:03 CST 2021 (crt)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of want to be contacted by phone or email filed by Michae-John D Taylor. (oyh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michae-John D Taylor. (oyh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michae-John D Taylor. (oyh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Don Patin filed by Michae-John D Taylor. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michae-John D Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael-John D Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?