Bekendam v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bekendam
Defendant: United Regional Hospital, State of Texas, TDCJ PD, City of Wichita Falls Police Dept and Wichita County Texas Clerk
Case Number: 3:2021cv00571
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. #8 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #9 Judgment, received back from Stephanie Bekendam as Attempted- Not Known Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (oyh)
April 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Mon Apr 19 09:23:34 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court prospectively CERTIFIES that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/19/2021) (axm)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Accepting #7 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/16/2021) (axm)
March 17, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Mar 17 16:22:09 CDT 2021 (crt)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is recommended that Bekendam's complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(h)(3) ("If the court determines at any time that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction, the court must dismiss the action."). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/17/2021) (mcrd)
March 12, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Mar 12 14:12:32 CST 2021 (crt)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against City of Wichita Falls Police Dept, State of Texas, TDCJ PD, United Regional Hospital, Wichita County Texas Clerk filed by Stephanie Bekendam. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bekendam v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDCJ PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wichita Falls Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita County Texas Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bekendam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?