Riggs Technology Holdings LLC v. Salesforce.com LLC
Plaintiff: RIGGS TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, LLC and Riggs Technology Holdings LLC
Defendant: SALESFORCE.COM, INC. and Salesforce.com LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00733
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for Defendant Salesforce.com LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is May 21, 2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 4/20/2021) (chmb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Riggs Technology Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramey, William)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Salesforce.com LLC; served on 3/31/2021. (Ramey, William)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Salesforce.com LLC. (mjr)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by RIGGS TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, LLC. (Ramey, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against SALESFORCE.COM, INC. filed by RIGGS TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11748675) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) US7299067, #2 Cover Sheet) (Ramey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs Technology Holdings LLC v. Salesforce.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIGGS TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings LLC
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALESFORCE.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?