Walker v. US Bank et al
Plaintiff: Fitzroy Ziggy Walker
Defendant: Friendly Chevrolet and US Bank
Case Number: 3:2021cv00758
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Failure to Timely Respond to Motion to Dismiss re: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Bank (Hayes, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), #8 U.S. Banks Motion to Dismiss; and #9 Friendly Chevrolets Motion to Dismiss, are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/10/2021) (svc)
May 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Friendly Chevrolet with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Khoury, Stephen)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Elizabeth Frances Hayes added to party US Bank(pty:dft) (Hayes, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Bank; served on 4/14/2021. (mjr)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Friendly Chevrolet; served on 4/5/2021. (mjr)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint,, filed by Friendly Chevrolet. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Stephen A Khoury added to party Friendly Chevrolet(pty:dft) (Khoury, Stephen)
April 2, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri Apr 2 08:56:45 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Friendly Chevrolet, US Bank. (oyh)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Friendly Chevrolet, US Bank filed by Fitzroy Ziggy Walker. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS130498) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (oyh)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. US Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzroy Ziggy Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friendly Chevrolet
Represented By: Jeffrey L Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?