Garry v. Yeager
Plaintiff: Albert J Garry
Defendant: Josh Yeager
Case Number: 3:2021cv00813
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Albert J Garry re: #11 Judge's Questionnaire (Garry, Albert)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S QUESTIONNAIRE sent to Albert J Garry. Responses due by 6/9/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/11/2021) (jmg)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Josh Yeager filed by Albert J Garry. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Garry, Albert)
April 12, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Apr 12 08:58:55 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 12, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Mon Apr 12 09:00:20 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 4/9/2021) (axm)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Josh Yeager must address the following deficiency: Complaint is not in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 5/10/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 4/9/2021) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se 1 Complaint Form, #2 Fed. R. Civ. P 8) (axm)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 4/9/2021) (axm)
April 9, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Apr 9 14:42:43 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Albert J Garry. (mjr)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Albert J Garry. (mjr)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Albert J Garry. (mjr)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Josh Yeager filed by Albert J Garry. (Exhibit #3 filed under separate seal) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr) Modified on 4/8/2021 (mjr).
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
April 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Apr 8 16:56:59 CDT 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garry v. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert J Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?