Castro v. The City of Grand Prairie et al
Plaintiff: John Anthony Castro
Defendant: Ellis County, The City of Grand Prairie, Brad Norman and Steve Collins
Case Number: 3:2021cv00885
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/23/2021) (svc)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE Returned to District Judge; Magistrate Judge David L. Horan no longer assigned to case. Per Docket entry 11 . (cea)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Payment for #2 Complaint filed by John Anthony Castro. ($402; Receipt number 0539-11825833). (Castro, John)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Thu Apr 22 07:42:00 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying #9 Emergency Application for A Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Anthony Castro (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/21/2021) (svc)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Emergency Application for A Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Anthony Castro. (twd)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: John Anthony Castro must address the following deficiency: pay the filing fee or file a properly supported IFP motion. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 5/19/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/19/2021) (mjr)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #1 Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/19/2021) (chmb)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court sua sponte orders that this civil action be TRANSFERRED to the Dallas Division of this Court. The hearing scheduled today (ECF No. #3 ) is CANCELED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/19/2021) (bdb)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Apr 19 16:26:14 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. NEF of Case transferrred in Mon Apr 19 09:47:16 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Apr 19 13:35:07 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Apr 19 08:46:41 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order New case number 3:21-cv-00885-L Castro v. Grand Prairie, City of et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 4:21cv0559-P. Future filings should be made in the DALLAS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: re: #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2021 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4th Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Mark Pittman. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/16/2021) (lrl)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ellis County, Grand Prairie, City of, Brad Norman filed by John Anthony Castro. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (lrl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: #1 Cover Sheet) (lrl). (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/19/2021) (cea).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Emergency Application for A Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Anthony Castro (lrl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. The City of Grand Prairie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Grand Prairie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?