Mary Kay Inc v. Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com
Plaintiff: John Doe 1-10 and Mary Kay Inc
Defendant: Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01074
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff Mary Kay's Motion For Leave to Serve Limited Third Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to Identify John Doe Defendants [Dkt. No. #3 ]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/7/2021) (mcrd)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC Order Referring #3 MOTION For Leave to Serve Limited Third Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to Identify John Doe Defendants to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for determination. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/18/2021) (chmb)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ygl)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION For Leave to Serve Limited Third Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to Identify John Doe Defendants filed by Mary Kay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Subpoena to eBay, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Subpoena to PayPal, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Britt, Kent) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (jmg).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Kay Inc. (Britt, Kent)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com, John Doe 1-10 filed by Mary Kay Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11886664) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Britt, Kent) Modified on 5/13/2021 to include payment information(ygl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary Kay Inc v. Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Inc
Represented By: Kent Allen Britt
Represented By: Christopher J Schwegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?