Malherbe et al v. Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated
Plaintiff: Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier and Andre Meier-Faes
Defendant: Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv01216
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/27/2021) (ygl)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court GRANTS #20 Agreed Motion to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their responses, if any, to the motion to dismiss by July 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/27/2021) (chmb)
July 23, 2021 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier, Andre Meier-Faes. (Stein, Howard) Modified event and text on 7/26/2021 (mjr).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER: As a result of the Court's July 5, 2021 18 Electronic Order, the Court TERMINATES AS MOOT #11 Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Howard J. Stein to Appear Telephonically or by Video Link at July 7, 2021 Hearing. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/6/2021) (chmb)
July 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The July 7, 2021 Initial Hearing is CANCELLED and will be reset by separate order. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/5/2021) (chmb)
July 4, 2021 Filing 17 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier, Andre Meier-Faes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, Howard)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (Lang, Joshua)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Makor Partners Ltd for Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated. (Lang, Joshua) Modified on 7/6/2021 (ykp).
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated re #13 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lang, Joshua)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Impropre Venue and Failure to State a Claim (Lang, Joshua)
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Impropre Venue and Failure to State a Claim filed by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated (Lang, Joshua)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION Allow Howard J. Stein to Appear Telephonically or by Video Link filed by Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier, Andre Meier-Faes (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, Howard)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court hereby sets this case for hearing on 7/7/2021 03:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Lead counsel and/or local counsel for each party shall be present. This hearing will be conducted in person. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/29/2021) (ykp)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Howard J. Stein ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/22/2021) (chmb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11990903) filed by Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier, Andre Meier-Faes (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed Order proposed order re PHV) (Stein, Howard)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 7/6/2021. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/21/2021) (ndt)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time of Deadline for Defendant's to Respond to Complaint filed by Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated Attorney Joshua David Lang added to party Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated(pty:dft) (Lang, Joshua)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated; served on 6/1/2021. (Stein, Howard) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (mjr).
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated. (oyh)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier, Andre Meier-Faes. (Stein, Howard) Modified filer text on 5/26/2021 (oyh).
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Andre Meier-Faes, Francois Malherbe, Yvonne Meier. (Filer fee $402.00 - Receipt Number 0539-11928310) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Malherbe German Judgment, #2 Exhibit(s) Malherbe Translation, #3 Exhibit(s) Meier German Judgment, #4 Exhibit(s) Meier Translation, #5 Exhibit(s) Stiller German Judgment, #6 Exhibit(s) Stiller Translation, #7 Exhibit(s) Kuss German Judgment, #8 Exhibit(s) Kuss Translation, #9 Exhibit(s) Schmudermaier German Judgment, #10 Exhibit(s) Schmudermaier Translation, #11 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Stein, Howard) Modified docket sheet and filers on 5/26/2021 (oyh). Modified fee amount on 5/27/2021 (jmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malherbe et al v. Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Gruss & Son Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan Ryan Childers
Represented By: Joshua David Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Malherbe
Represented By: Howard Jay Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Meier
Represented By: Howard Jay Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Meier-Faes
Represented By: Howard Jay Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?