McGee v. Motor Care et al
Plaintiff: Roy E McGee
Defendant: Motor Care and E Sayas Belay
Case Number: 3:2021cv01306
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Thu Jun 10 08:54:01 CDT 2021 (crt) Modified on 6/10/2021 (mjr).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First Judge's Questionnaire sent to Roy E McGee. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/9/2021) (mjr)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No further process shall issue except upon further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/9/2021) (mjr)
June 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Jun 8 11:04:19 CDT 2021 (crt)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roy E McGee. (ygl)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against E Sayas Belay, Motor Care filed by Roy E McGee. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ygl)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ygl)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Motor Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy E McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motor Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Sayas Belay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?