Continental Western Insurance Company v. QQT Trucking LLC
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance Company
Defendant: QQT Trucking LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01323
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Pretrial Order with attached Proposed Scheduling Order by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Poelma, Randall)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall J Poelma, Jr for William D. Mahoney on behalf of Continental Western Insurance Company. (Poelma, Randall)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Without Designating Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/28/2021) (chmb)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION Leave to Appear Without Designating Local Counsel filed by Continental Western Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Poelma, Randall)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/16/2021) (ykp)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QQT Trucking LLC. (Fletcher, Douglas)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/16/2021) (chmb)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by QQT Trucking LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Douglas D Fletcher added to party QQT Trucking LLC(pty:dft) (Fletcher, Douglas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to QQT Trucking LLC; served on 6/14/2021. (Poelma, Randall) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (jmg).
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to QQT Trucking LLC. (ygl)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
June 8, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Western Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate WR Berkley Corporation for Continental Western Insurance Company. (See document #1 -3 for image.) (ygl)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against QQT Trucking LLC filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11959092) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Bill of Lading, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Poelma, Randall) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/9/2021) (ygl). Modified on 6/9/2021, flattened CIP (ygl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Western Insurance Company v. QQT Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall J Poelma, Jr
Represented By: William David Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QQT Trucking LLC
Represented By: Douglas D Fletcher
Represented By: Jeffrey D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?