Kennard et al v. Fire Truck et al
Plaintiff: Romona Yvette Kennard, Parkland Hospital, Romona Y Kennard and Romona Kennard
Defendant: Fire Truck and Studio Car
Case Number: 3:2021cv01569
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 Mail returned as undeliverable. #11 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #12 Judgment, received back from Romona Yvette Kennard as Attempted - not known - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this action is summarily DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. The Court prospectively CERTIFIES that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/12/2021) (ygl)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ACCEPTING #7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/12/2021) (ygl)
August 12, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Thu Aug 12 11:44:32 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. #1 Consent Form, #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from Romona Yvette Kennard as Attempted - not known - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 Mail returned as undeliverable. #7 Findings and Recommendations on Case, #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, received back from Romona Yvette Kennard as Attempted - not known - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Doc. 4, is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Should the district judge decline to accept the recommendation of the magistrate judge, Plaintiff may re-urge her motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/16/2021) (mcrd)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Kennard's complaint should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. In addition, Kennard should be WARNED that if she persists in filing frivolous, baseless or duplicative actions, or actions over which the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the Court may impose monetary sanctions and/or bar her from bringing any further action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/16/2021) (mcrd)
July 16, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Fri Jul 16 15:54:45 CDT 2021 (crt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER. Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written Notice of Change of Address with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/9/2021) (chmb)
July 9, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of document 6 Fri Jul 9 14:42:23 CDT 2021 (crt)
July 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Jul 8 08:30:36 CDT 2021 (crt)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Romona Yvette Kennard. (jmg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Romona Yvette Kennard. (jmg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Fire Truck, Studio Car filed by Romona Yvette Kennard. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennard et al v. Fire Truck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romona Yvette Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkland Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romona Y Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romona Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Truck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Studio Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?