Daneshmandi v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kazem Daneshmandi
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company and The Chris Hatfield Agency Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv01621
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is hereby REMANDED to the 191st Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/3/2021) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (mjr)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, The Chris Hatfield Agency Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Higgins, Roger)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On July 13, 2021, the defendant removed this civil action to this court. Local Rule 81.2 provides that "[w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). If the plaintiff concurs in the accuracy of another party's previously-filed certificate, the plaintiff may adopt that certificate." LR 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) in turn require that "[w]hen a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with...a separately signed certificate of interested persons...that contains...a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities that are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 21 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/15/2021) (chmb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Higgins, Roger)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12045263) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Cover Sheet, #18 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Higgins, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daneshmandi v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Austin John
Represented By: Roger D Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger D Higgins
Represented By: Christopher Austin John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Roger D Higgins
Represented By: Christopher Austin John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chris Hatfield Agency Inc
Represented By: Roger D Higgins
Represented By: Christopher Austin John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazem Daneshmandi
Represented By: Benjamin Palatiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?