Chineme v. Mahan
Plaintiff: Andre Chineme and Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family)
Defendant: Megan Suarez Mahan
Case Number: 3:2021cv01812
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 Mail returned as undeliverable. #13 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family). received back from Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family) as Return to Sender-Not Deliverable as Addressed-Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ykp)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss the #6 amended complaint without prejudice for want of prosecution under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/10/2021) (mla)
September 10, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Fri Sep 10 16:36:15 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family) re: #5 Order And Notice of Deficiency, #9 Findings and Recommendations on Motion, 10 Electronic Order, #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (mjr)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Chineme's motions to proceed in forma pauperis are DEEMED MOOT, and he must pay the $402.00 filing fee by 8/27/2021. Failure to pay the filing fee within the time provided could result in a recommendation that his case be dismissed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/16/2021) (ctf)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's August 12, 2021 FCR is VACATED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/16/2021) (chmb)
August 16, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Aug 16 10:40:01 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 13, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Fri Aug 13 11:44:50 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **** VACATED PER 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER **** FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONOF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #4 , #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Chineme's motions to proceed in forma pauperis are deemed moot, and he must pay the $402.00 filing fee by 8/27/2021. Failure to pay the filing fee within the time provided could result in a recommendation that his case be dismissed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/12/2021) (mcrd) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mjr).
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 Amended Document by Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family) as to #6 Amended Complaint. (mjr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family). (mjr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Megan Suarez Mahan filed by Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Andre Chineme must address the following deficiency: Complaint is not in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a), the $402 fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted, and the request must include a financial affidavit. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 9/6/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/6/2021) (Attachments: #1 Fed R Civ P 8, #2 Pro Se 1, #3 IFP) (jmg)
August 6, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Aug 6 14:59:35 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 5, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Aug 5 10:55:40 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andre Chineme. (ndt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Megan Suarez Mahan filed by Andre Chineme. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chineme v. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Chineme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Chineme (Andre of the Chineme Family)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Suarez Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?