Barnes v. Remedy Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Megan Barnes
Defendant: Remedy Group, LLC, Mark Meyers and Remedy Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01815
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Barcus on behalf of Mark Meyers, Remedy Group LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barcus, John)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Mark Meyers answer or response due 10/8/2021; Remedy Group LLC answer or response due 10/8/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/17/2021) (chmb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Mark Meyers, Remedy Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gary D Eisenstat added to party Mark Meyers(pty:dft), Attorney Gary D Eisenstat added to party Remedy Group LLC(pty:dft) (Eisenstat, Gary)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Megan Barnes; Mark Meyers; served on 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Vick, Paul) Modified text on 9/14/2021 (ygl).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul G. Vick. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/24/2021) (chmb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12163455) filed by Megan Barnes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Vick, Paul) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/25/2021 to flatten pdf) (axm).
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Mark Meyers, Remedy Group LLC. (axm)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Megan Barnes. (Vick, Paul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul G Vick on behalf of Megan Barnes. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vick, Paul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul G Vick for Hutton Sentell on behalf of Megan Barnes. (Vick, Paul)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mark Meyers, Remedy Group LLC. (axm)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Megan Barnes, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/4/2021) (chmb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Megan Barnes. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12110978) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Vick, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/5/2021 to flatten pdf) (axm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Remedy Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Barnes
Represented By: Paul G Vick
Represented By: Hutton W Sentell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remedy Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Meyers
Represented By: Gary D Eisenstat
Represented By: John M Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remedy Group LLC
Represented By: Gary D Eisenstat
Represented By: John M Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?