Axe Memorial United Methodist Church v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Axe Memorial United Methodist Church
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01948
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for a one week docket on 2/6/2023 before Judge David C Godbey. The final pretrial conference will be set by separate order or notice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/17/2021) (ygl)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/25/2021) (ndt)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Carter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steadfast Insurance Company (Ferguson, Carter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support 3-2) (Ferguson, Carter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12152452) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support 2-1, #3 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support 2-2, #4 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support 2-3) (Ferguson, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axe Memorial United Methodist Church v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axe Memorial United Methodist Church
Represented By: Marc K Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter L Ferguson
Represented By: Landon Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?