Ann Whitecotton Homes LLC et al v. Zurn Industries LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ann Whitecotton Homes, LLC, Great American Assurance Company and Ann Whitecotton Homes LLC
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC, California Faucets, Zurn Industries LLC doing business as Zurn Industries Plumbing Products LLC, California Faucets Inc and McKinzie's Plumbing LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01965
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to McKinzie's Plumbing LLC. (ygl)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS filed by Ann Whitecotton Homes LLC. (Surber, William)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Faucets Inc, Zurn Industries LLC, McKinzie's Plumbing LLC filed by Ann Whitecotton Homes LLC, Great American Assurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File. (Clerk to file amended petition filed as Exhibit 1.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/8/2021) (chmb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition filed by Great American Assurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Surber, William)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Zurn Industries LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cho, Justin)
August 24, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Tue Aug 24 08:48:00 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
August 23, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurn Industries LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Rexnord Corporation for Zurn Industries LLC. (See document #1 - 7 for image.) (jmg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Zurn Industries LLC. (Filing fee $402.00; receipt number 0539-12158185.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Copy of State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C - First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Fed CoverSheet, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Supp Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit(s) F - List of Counsel, #7 Exhibit(s) G - Certificate of Interested Persons) (Cho, Justin) Modified filing fee on 8/24/2021 (jmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ann Whitecotton Homes LLC et al v. Zurn Industries LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Whitecotton Homes, LLC
Represented By: W Chris Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Assurance Company
Represented By: W Chris Surber
Represented By: William Christopher Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Whitecotton Homes LLC
Represented By: William Christopher Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC
Represented By: Byron L Kelley
Represented By: J. Allen Smith
Represented By: Justin Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Faucets
Represented By: David A McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC doing business as Zurn Industries Plumbing Products LLC
Represented By: Justin Cho
Represented By: Byron L Kelley
Represented By: J. Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Faucets Inc
Represented By: David A McFarland
Represented By: Christopher George Rigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinzie's Plumbing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?