Korean Cultural Center of Dallas v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Korean Cultural Center of Dallas
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Chubb US Holdings, Inc. and Chubb US Holdings Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv01971
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Jury Trial set for four-week docket beginning 10/3/2022 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 12/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2021. Motions due by 6/1/2022. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 9/23/2022. Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/20/2021) (mla)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties reported that "Plaintiff has agreed to dismiss [defendant] Chubb without prejudice." Joint Status Report (docket entry 13) at 2. Accordingly, by November 1, 2021, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion to dismiss or stipulation of dismissal as to the defendant Chubb US Holdings, Inc., incorrectly named as Chubb. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/20/2021) (chmb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Korean Cultural Center of Dallas. (Hunziker, Scott)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Paul Barmore on behalf of Korean Cultural Center of Dallas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barmore, Benjamin)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/29/2021) (svc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Korean Cultural Center of Dallas. (ndt)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal Order. It is ORDERED that this case is REOPENED, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the plaintiff's certificate of interested persons (attached to the motion as Exhibit 1). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/28/2021) (ndt)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Amended and Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration of Dismissal Order filed by Korean Cultural Center of Dallas (Hunziker, Scott) Modified event text and linkage on 9/29/2021 (jmg).
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION Reconsideration of Dismissal Order re Terminated Case, 6 Electronic Order, filed by Korean Cultural Center of Dallas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hunziker, Scott)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On August 27, 2021, the plaintiff was ordered to file a certificate of interested persons within 21 days (docket entry 3) but has failed to do so. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Rule 16(f)(1)(c). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/22/2021) (chmb)
September 22, 2021 Civil case terminated. (chmb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D Taylor on behalf of Korean Cultural Center of Dallas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Taylor, William)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, by September 16, 2021, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/28/2021) (chmb)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On August 23, 2021, the defendant removed this civil action to this court. Local Rule 81.2 provides that "[w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). If the plaintiff concurs in the accuracy of another party's previously-filed certificate, the plaintiff may adopt that certificate." LR 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) in turn require that "[w]hen a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with...a separately signed certificate of interested persons...that contains...a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities that are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 21 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/27/2021) (chmb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
August 23, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Please see #1 -14 for image). (ygl)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12160290) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) A1, #5 Exhibit(s) B, #6 Exhibit(s) B1, #7 Exhibit(s) B2, #8 Exhibit(s) B3, #9 Exhibit(s) B4, #10 Exhibit(s) B5, #11 Exhibit(s) B6, #12 Exhibit(s) B7, #13 Exhibit(s) B8, #14 Exhibit(s) C) (Tippett, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korean Cultural Center of Dallas v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korean Cultural Center of Dallas
Represented By: Scott G Hunziker
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Barmore
Represented By: William D Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Crystal L Vogt
Represented By: Todd M Tippett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb US Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Crystal L Vogt
Represented By: Todd M Tippett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb US Holdings Inc
Represented By: Todd M Tippett
Represented By: Crystal L Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?