Williams v. Army and Air Force Exchange Service
Plaintiff: Jack Williams
Defendant: Army and Air Force Exchange Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv02085
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2022. Discovery due by 6/26/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 3/28/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/11/2022. Motions due by 7/25/2022. Status Report due by 7/18/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/24/2021) (mcrd)
September 24, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Fri Sep 24 18:00:33 CDT 2021 (crt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Army and Air Force Exchange Service. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The plaintiff may file a response by 9/28/2021. The defendant may file a reply by 10/12/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/8/2021) (mcrd)
September 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Wed Sep 8 15:39:22 CDT 2021 (crt)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Army and Air Force Exchange Service with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/23/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/2/2021) (mcrd)
September 2, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Sep 2 11:00:38 CDT 2021 (crt)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Army and Air Force Exchange Service re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) Modified text on 9/1/2021 (mjr).
September 1, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 5. Wed Sep 1 11:34:49 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Army and Air Force Exchange Service. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Army and Air Force Exchange Service. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Index of State Court Records, #4 Civil Case Information Sheet, #5 Service Member Affidavit by Plaintiff, #6 Petition: Small Claims Case, #7 Citation, #8 Plea to the Jurisdiction and Answer) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Army and Air Force Exchange Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Army and Air Force Exchange Service
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?