Caulfield v. Hobby Lobby Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Darieka Caulfield
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv02146
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Hobby Lobby Stores Inc re: #9 First MOTION to Remand (Gant, Robin)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Darieka Caulfield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Taghavi, Tandis)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Darieka Caulfield. (Taghavi, Tandis)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand filed by Darieka Caulfield (Taghavi, Tandis)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/28/2021) (ctf)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Sep 28 14:10:23 CDT 2021 (crt)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darieka Caulfield identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Kelley Law Firm PC for Darieka Caulfield. (Morgan, Patricia)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission of Tandis Taghavi filed by Darieka Caulfield (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Morgan, Patricia)
September 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Tandis Taghavi ("counsel"), whose name appears on a pleading in this case, is not a member of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Accordingly, by September 27, 2021, counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership* or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (*A letter stating the date of counsel's admission to the Bar of this court is satisfactory documentation.) (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/11/2021) (chmb)
September 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On September 9, 2021, the defendant removed this civil action to this court. Local Rule 81.2 provides that "[w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). If the plaintiff concurs in the accuracy of another party's previously-filed certificate, the plaintiff may adopt that certificate." LR 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) in turn require that when a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with "a separately signed certificate of interested persons -- in a form approved by the clerk -- that contains -- in addition to the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) -- a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities that are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, by September 30, 2021, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/11/2021) (chmb)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Gant, Robin)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12203872) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Gant, Robin)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Sep 9 14:06:24 CDT 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caulfield v. Hobby Lobby Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darieka Caulfield
Represented By: Tandis Taghavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc
Represented By: Robin R Gant
Represented By: Dwayne Isaiah Lewis, II
Represented By: Zach T Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?