Whiteley v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Whiteley
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2021cv02299
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis until Judgment is entered. However, because Plaintiff is represented by counsel, the Court directs her attorney to serve Defendant with a summons and complaint in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and file proof of service with the Court. FED. R. CIV. P. 4(l). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/22/2021) (jmg)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elizabeth Whiteley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Elizabeth Whiteley must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff failed to submit a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis and financial affidavit pursuant to Local Rule 83.6 and Form AO 239. The Courts form must be filed with the Court without redactions. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). ( Deadline to cure the deficiency is 10/29/2021.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/4/2021) (Attachments: #1 Form AO 239) (ygl)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Betty Herrera. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/4/2021) (ygl)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elizabeth Whiteley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12266096) filed by Elizabeth Whiteley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel does not appear to be admitted to the Northern District of Texas. Compl. (ECF No. 1). Therefore, by 10/29/2021, Plaintiff's counsel must secure local counsel for Plaintiff or apply for admission pro hac vice pursuant to Local Rule 83.9. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/29/2021) (ndt)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Elizabeth Whiteley must address the following deficiency: the motion is deficient because Plaintiff failed to submit a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis and financial affidavit. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 10/29/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/29/2021) (Attachments: #1 IFP) (ndt)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (ygl)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elizabeth Whiteley. (Herrera, Betty) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened PDF on 9/28/2021) (ygl).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elizabeth Whiteley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) In Forma Pauperis) (Herrera, Betty)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Elizabeth Whiteley. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons, #4 Exhibit(s) Summons) (Herrera, Betty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiteley v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Whiteley
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?