Karamatic v. Peyton Resource Group LP
Plaintiff: Camara Karamatic
Defendant: Peyton Resource Group, L.P. and Peyton Resource Group LP
Case Number: 3:2021cv02304
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Peyton Resource Group LP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Stephanie A Erhart added to party Peyton Resource Group LP(pty:dft) (Erhart, Stephanie)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Peyton Resource Group LP, served on 11/3/2021. (mla)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Peyton Resource Group LP. (mjr)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camara Karamatic. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Peyton Resource Group, L.P. filed by Camara Karamatic. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12256479) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Information Cover Sheet) (O'Kelly, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karamatic v. Peyton Resource Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camara Karamatic
Represented By: Nicholas A O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Resource Group, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Resource Group LP
Represented By: Stephanie A Erhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?