Shane Crider v. Cantex T & R LLC
Defendant: CANTEX T & R, LLC and Cantex T & R LLC
Not Classified By Court: Shane Crider
Case Number: 3:2021cv02472
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - On October 8, 2021, the court ordered Plaintiff to file an entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Rule 83.10(a) within twenty (20) days, and warned Plaintiff that failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case without prejudice without further notice. (Docket No. 4). Plaintiff has not filed an entry of appearance of local counsel, and therefore this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/2/2021) (chmb)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to refile. The attached PDF is not regarding this case. The Court has no alternative but to deny this motion. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/12/2021) (chmb) Modified on 11/2/2021 (chmb).
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 ***FILED IN THE WRONG CASE***First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shane Crider (Strickland, Duncan) Modified on 10/13/2021 (ykp).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Shane Crider, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/8/2021) (chmb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cantex T & R LLC. (ygl)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
October 7, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shane Crider. (See document #1 -2 for image). (ygl)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shane Crider filed by Shane Crider. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12286174) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s)) (Strickland, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shane Crider v. Cantex T & R LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shane Crider
Represented By: Duncan Harold Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANTEX T & R, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantex T & R LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?