Robinson v. CSL Plasma Center
Plaintiff: Neiman V Robinson
Defendant: CSL Plasma Center
Not Classified By Court: Neiman V. Robinson
Case Number: 3:2021cv02520
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2022. Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/20/2022. Motions due by 6/3/2022. Status Report due by 5/27/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/9/2021) (mcrd) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/9/2021) (mcrd).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Nov 9 10:40:58 CST 2021 (crt)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Nov 9 15:40:50 CST 2021 (crt)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by CSL Plasma Center. (Brodrick, Collin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by Neiman V Robinson re: #5 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing. (mjr)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/18/2021) (mcrd)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Oct 18 09:26:32 CDT 2021 (crt)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Thu Oct 14 12:59:22 CDT 2021 (crt)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSL Plasma Center identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CSL Limited, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CSL Plasma, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CSL Behring, LLC for CSL Plasma Center. (Brodrick, Collin)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by CSL Plasma Center. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12298071) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Brodrick, Collin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. CSL Plasma Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Neiman V. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Plasma Center
Represented By: Bruce J Douglas
Represented By: Collin Kneale Brodrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neiman V Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?